LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New York NY
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S06239
Action History
NY
New York Senate Bill S06239
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill S06239
Action History
Senate
05/23/2024
SUBSTITUTED BY A7495
Senate
03/04/2024
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Senate
02/28/2024
2ND REPORT CAL.
Senate
02/27/2024
1ST REPORT CAL.550
Senate
01/03/2024
REFERRED TO CODES