Senate | 11/25/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.541 | ||
Senate | 11/25/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.425 | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | substituted for a6026 | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2024 | referred to judiciary | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.724 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1684 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |