Assembly | 06/03/2024 | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1477 | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6318A | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1519 |