Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A6821 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.727 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.822 |