Assembly | 03/06/2024 | referred to consumer affairs and protection | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.401 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 6323B | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.737 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 6323A |