Assembly | 05/30/2024 | referred to education | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1462 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO LIBRARIES | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1649 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 6350B | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LIBRARIES | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 6350A |