Senate | 05/29/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A7341B | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1306 | ||
Senate | 05/09/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 6357B | ||
Senate | 05/09/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 6357A | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1037 |