Senate | 06/07/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6408B | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.385 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 6408A | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |