Senate | 06/28/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.154 | ||
Senate | 06/28/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.103 | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | substituted for a6901a | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2024 | referred to real property taxation | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.696 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1756 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 6409A | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |