Senate | 06/04/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | referred to judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.717 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.795 |