Assembly | 06/03/2024 | referred to children and families | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1478 | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1524 |