Assembly | 03/11/2024 | referred to labor | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.402 | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 6476B | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 6476A | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1207 |