Assembly | 05/30/2024 | referred to governmental employees | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.508 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1059 |