Senate | 05/31/2023 | SUBSTITUTED BY A6480 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1316 | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 6482A | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |