Senate | 11/22/2024 | APPROVAL MEMO.18 | ||
Senate | 11/22/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.504 | ||
Senate | 11/15/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.524 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted for a3122a | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | referred to health | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1480 | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1757 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 6504A | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |