Senate | 01/09/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | referred to housing | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.749 |