Senate | 09/20/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.480 | ||
Senate | 09/19/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.570 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | substituted for a1565a | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1581 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 6519A | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |