Senate | 06/04/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A7701A | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1692 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 6523A | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | referred to veterans' affairs | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1287 |