Senate | 12/08/2023 | VETOED MEMO.106 | ||
Senate | 11/29/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.892 | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | substituted for a7220 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1288 | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |