Senate | 12/22/2023 | VETOED MEMO.143 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.866 | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2023 | substituted for a7338 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1527 | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | REFERRED TO HEALTH |