Senate | 06/30/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.176 | ||
Senate | 06/26/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.675 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | substituted for a1246 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | home rule request | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1390 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | REFERRED TO CITIES 2 |