Senate | 12/21/2024 | APPROVAL MEMO.85 | ||
Senate | 12/21/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.657 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.312 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | substituted for a6219b | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6584C | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1115 | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 6584B | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6584A | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1529 | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |