Assembly | 06/05/2024 | referred to labor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1200 | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/12/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 6602A | ||
Senate | 01/12/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.987 |