Senate | 06/05/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | referred to environmental conservation | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.641 | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6606A | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1150 |