Senate | 06/08/2023 | SUBSTITUTED BY A6724 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1220 | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 6610A | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES 2 | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | REFERRED TO CITIES 2 |