Assembly | 03/18/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.167 | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2024 | substituted for a5859 | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2024 | referred to correction | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.208 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1761 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |