Senate | 07/19/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.202 | ||
Senate | 07/13/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.769 | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | substituted for a6723a | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | home rule request | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1762 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 6622A | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |