Senate | 06/07/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.629 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 6638B | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 6638A | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |