Senate | 06/07/2023 | SUBSTITUTED BY A6113B | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1530 | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 6640B | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES 1 | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 6640A | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |