Senate | 09/27/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.382 | ||
Senate | 09/20/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.527 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted for a6930a | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | referred to transportation | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1483 | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 6670A | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |