Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A7071A | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1409 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | AMENDED (T) 6671A | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.969 |