Senate | 05/28/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A7790A | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | AMENDED (T) 6674A | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1163 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | referred to insurance | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1264 |