Senate | 06/05/2023 | SUBSTITUTED BY A7061A | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1393 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 6682A | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | REFERENCE CHANGED TO CITIES 1 | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |