Senate | 06/05/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A9578 | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1360 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Senate | 12/20/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 6715B | ||
Senate | 12/20/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | RECOMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1695 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 6715A | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |