Senate | 12/08/2023 | VETOED MEMO.107 | ||
Senate | 11/29/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.700 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | substituted for a5394 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | referred to judiciary | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1038 | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |