Senate | 01/30/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | REFERRED TO INSURANCE | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.94 | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 6738A | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |