Senate | 09/15/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.458 | ||
Senate | 09/07/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.722 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | substituted for a6701a | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | home rule request | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1696 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 6743A | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |