Senate | 06/22/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.137 | ||
Senate | 06/22/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.649 | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | substituted for a6683b | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6749B | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1056 | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 6749A | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | REFERRED TO HEALTH |