Senate | 06/07/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 04/15/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6752B | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6752A | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.657 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1652 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |