Senate | 05/15/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A7041A | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.892 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | RECOMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6797A | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1119 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |