Senate | 05/21/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A6738A | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1159 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 6798A | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CODES |