Senate | 05/21/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A6811C | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1117 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 6809B | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 6809A | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO FINANCE |