Senate | 06/07/2023 | SUBSTITUTED BY A6781A | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1214 | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 6813A | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LIBRARIES | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | REFERRED TO LIBRARIES |