Senate | 06/07/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 6852A | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.498 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1165 |