Senate | 12/08/2023 | VETOED MEMO.108 | ||
Senate | 11/29/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.870 | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | substituted for a7250 | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | home rule request | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1534 | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |