Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.554 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted for a10544 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | referred to libraries and education technology | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1463 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 6868A | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LIBRARIES | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO LIBRARIES | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1215 |