Senate | 10/25/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.599 | ||
Senate | 10/13/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | home rule request | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.793 | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | substituted for a6795a | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | AMENDED (T) 6879A | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1166 | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |