Senate | 06/07/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | AMEND BY RESTORING TO ORIGINAL PRINT 6906 | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.893 | ||
Senate | 02/23/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 6906B | ||
Senate | 02/23/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 6906A | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1300 |