Senate | 06/03/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | referred to transportation | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.598 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1123 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |