Assembly | 05/28/2024 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1394 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1405 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |